Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/19/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/20/2012