There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Reporting Efficiency Improvement Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Reporting Efficiency Improvement Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Reporting Efficiency Improvement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Reporting Efficiency Improvement Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Reporting Efficiency Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To eliminate unnecessary reporting requirements for unfunded programs under the Office of Justice Programs.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/05/2012Became Public Law No: 112-189. (TXT | PDF)
10/05/2012Signed by President.
09/25/2012Presented to President.
09/22/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2012Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6674)
09/11/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5796)
09/10/2012Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-648.
07/25/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/05/2012Became Public Law No: 112-189. (TXT | PDF)
10/05/2012Signed by President.
09/25/2012HousePresented to President.
09/24/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/22/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2012SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6674)
09/12/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/11/2012-3:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/11/2012-3:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5796)
09/11/2012-3:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6189.
09/11/2012-3:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5796)
09/11/2012-3:35pmHouseMr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/10/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 466.
09/10/2012HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-648.
08/01/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/01/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/25/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/25/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/25/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary07/25/2012 Referred to
08/01/2012 Markup by
09/10/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-648
Senate Judiciary09/12/2012 Referred to
09/22/2012 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.6189.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6189. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-189 (10/05/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on September 11, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Reporting Efficiency Improvement Act - Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to repeal a requirement that the Attorney General submit a report to Congress on grants to state and local governments for a program or project to develop or improve the capability to analyze deoxyribonucleic acid (DNA).

Amends the Police Corps Act to repeal the requirement for the Director of the Office of the Police Corps and Law Enforcement Education to submit an annual report on the Police Corps program.