There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Asthma Inhalers Relief Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

Asthma Inhalers Relief Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to allow for the distribution, sale, and consumption in the United States of remaining inventories of over-the-counter CFC epinephrine inhalers.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/12/2012Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 229 - 182 (Roll no. 623).
09/14/2012Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 112-673.
07/25/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
12/12/2012-5:20pmOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 229 - 182 (Roll no. 623).
Action By: House of Representatives
12/12/2012-5:12pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6740-6741)
Action By: House of Representatives
12/12/2012-2:31pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/12/2012-1:53pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6190.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/12/2012-1:53pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6724-6728; text of measure as reported in House: CR H6724)
Action By: House of Representatives
12/12/2012-1:53pmMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/14/2012Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 485.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/14/2012Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 112-673.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/27/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/25/2012Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/25/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/25/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/25/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/25/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/25/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/25/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/25/2012 Referred to
09/14/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-673
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power07/27/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6190.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6190. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (09/14/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Asthma Inhalers Relief Act of 2012 - Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to: (1) permit the distribution, sale, and consumption in the United States of remaining inventories of CFC epinephrine inhalers manufactured pursuant to the exception for medical devices under the Clean Air Act; (2) not take any enforcement action or otherwise seek to restrict the distribution, sale, or consumption of such inhalers on the basis of any federal law implementing the Montreal Protocol on Substances that Deplete the Ozone Layer; and (3) issue, in response to a request of any distributor or seller of such inhalers, a No Action Assurance Letter stating that the EPA will not initiate an enforcement action relating to the distribution or sale of any such inhaler occurring prior to August 1, 2013.

Defines "CFC epinephrine inhaler" to mean any epinephrine inhaler containing chlorofluorocarbons that was manufactured and classified as over-the-counter before January 1, 2012.

Terminates this Act on August 1, 2013.