There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend section 1059(e) of the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2006 to clarify that a period of employment abroad by the Chief of Mission or United States Armed Forces as a translator, interpreter, or in a security-related position in an executive or managerial capacity is to be counted as a period of residence and physical presence in the United States for purposes of qualifying for naturalization, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 1059(e) of the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2006 to clarify that a period of employment abroad by the Chief of Mission or United States Armed Forces as a translator, interpreter, or in an executive level security position is to be counted as a period of residence and physical presence in the United States for purposes of qualifying for naturalization if at least a portion of such period was spent in Iraq or Afghanistan, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
12/28/2012Became Public Law No: 112-227. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/2012Signed by President.
12/19/2012Presented to President.
12/17/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8087-8088)
12/05/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6650-6651)
07/26/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
12/28/2012Became Public Law No: 112-227. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/2012Signed by President.
12/19/2012HousePresented to President.
12/18/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8087-8088)
12/06/2012SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/05/2012-10:37amHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
12/05/2012-10:37amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/05/2012-10:37amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6650-6651)
12/05/2012-10:29amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6223.
12/05/2012-10:29amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6650-6652)
12/05/2012-10:29amHouseMr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/14/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/26/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/26/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/16/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/26/2012 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement08/14/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6223. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-227 (12/28/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on December 5, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2006 to consider the period of time that a person was employed by the Chief of Mission or the U.S. Armed Forces, under contract with the Chief of Mission or the U.S. Armed Forces, or was employed by a firm or corporation under contract with the Chief of Mission or the U.S. Armed Forces as a translator, interpreter, or in an executive or managerial level security position as a period of U.S. residence and physical presence for naturalization purposes if at least a portion of such period was spent abroad working directly in such capacity for the Chief of Mission or U.S. Armed Forces.

Makes such amendment effective as if included in the enactment of a specified section of the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2006.