There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Online Ammunition Sales Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require face to face purchases of ammunition, to require licensing of ammunition dealers, and to require reporting regarding bulk purchases of ammunition.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/31/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
08/14/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/31/2012Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/01/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 08/03/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/03/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/03/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/03/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/03/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 08/03/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/03/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 08/03/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/03/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 08/03/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 08/03/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/03/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 08/03/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/03/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 08/03/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 08/03/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/03/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/03/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/03/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 08/03/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 08/03/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/03/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/03/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/03/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/03/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/03/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/03/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/03/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 08/03/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/10/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/10/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/05/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/17/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/20/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/31/2012 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security08/14/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6241. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/31/2012)

Stop Online Ammunition Sales Act of 2012 - Amends the federal criminal code to require the licensing of ammunition dealers.

Prohibits any person except a licensed importer, manufacturer, or dealer from: (1) selling ammunition, with an exception for a sale of ammunition to a licensed importer, manufacturer, or dealer; or (2) engaging in the business of importing or manufacturing ammunition, or in the course of such business, from shipping, transporting, or receiving ammunition. Prohibits a licensed importer, manufacturer, or dealer from: (1) transferring ammunition to a person without verifying the person's identity by examining a valid identification document containing a photograph of such person; or (2) selling or delivering any ammunition (currently, any armor-piercing ammunition) to any person unless the licensee notes in his records the person's name, age, and place of residence, if the person is an individual, or the person's identity and principal and local places of business, if the person is a business entity.

Applies prohibitions applicable to the shipping or transport of firearms, and record-keeping requirements applicable to the importation, production, shipment, receipt, sale, or other disposition of firearms, to ammunition.

Requires each licensee to: (1) prepare a report of multiple sales or other dispositions whenever the licensee sells or otherwise disposes of more than 1,000 rounds of ammunition to an unlicensed person at one time or during any five consecutive business days; and (2) forward such report to the specified office and to the department of state police, the state law enforcement agency, or the local law enforcement agency of the jurisdiction in which the sale took place by the close of business on the day the multiple sale occurs.