Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/01/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 08/03/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/03/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/03/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/03/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/03/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 08/03/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/03/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 08/03/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/03/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 08/03/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 08/03/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/03/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 08/03/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/03/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 08/03/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 08/03/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/03/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/03/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/03/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 08/03/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 08/03/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/03/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/03/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/03/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/03/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/03/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/03/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/03/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 08/03/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/10/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/10/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/05/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/17/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/20/2012