Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/10/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/11/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/16/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/31/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/31/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/07/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/28/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/28/2012