Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
01/10/2013 Became Public Law No: 112-254.
01/10/2013 Signed by President.
12/31/2012 Presented to President.
12/27/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8454)
12/20/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 12/19/2012 H7336)
08/01/2012 Introduced in House