Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/10/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/27/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/29/2012