Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/12/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/12/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 09/12/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/19/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/16/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/16/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/16/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 10/16/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/06/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/06/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 12/12/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/12/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/12/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/12/2012