Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/12/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 09/12/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/16/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/16/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 10/16/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/06/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/06/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 12/12/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/12/2012