Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 08/03/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/13/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/18/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/21/2012