Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/10/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/08/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/10/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/10/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/16/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/24/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/01/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/01/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/27/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/27/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/17/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/17/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/18/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/18/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/11/2012