Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
01/14/2013 Became Public Law No: 112-271.
01/14/2013 Signed by President.
01/03/2013 Presented to President.
01/01/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideraation: CR H7559; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/30/2012 H7447)
12/11/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7752)
11/27/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6440)
08/02/2012 Introduced in House