Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/01/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 10/04/2011