Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/14/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/27/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/05/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/05/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/05/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/05/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/05/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/11/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 12/11/2012