There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Employment Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Department of Veterans Affairs to consider veterans before non-veterans with respect to employment in the competitive service at the Department, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/11/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/21/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/11/2012Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/2012Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/14/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/02/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/27/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform09/11/2012 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs09/11/2012 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity09/21/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6372.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6372. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/11/2012)

Veterans Employment Act of 2012 - Instructs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to consider all qualified veterans before any non-veterans for employment in the competitive service at the VA.

Requires the VA to consider, among qualified veterans, those with a service-connected disability having a rating of 30% before considering non-service-connected disabled veterans.

Requires the Director of the VA to submit annual reports to Congress with respect to the hiring of veterans in the competitive service.