There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

VA Major Construction Authorization and Expiring Authorities Extension Act of 2012

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

VA Major Construction Authorization and Expiring Authorities Extension Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Major Construction Authorization and Expiring Authorities Extension Act of 2012

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

VA Major Construction Authorization and Expiring Authorities Extension Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To authorize certain Department of Veterans Affairs major medical facility projects, to amend title 38, United States Code, to extend certain authorities of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize certain Department of Veterans Affairs major medical facility projects and leases, to amend title 38, United States Code, to extend certain authorities of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/05/2012Became Public Law No: 112-191. (TXT | PDF)
10/05/2012Signed by President.
09/25/2012Presented to President.
09/22/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6671)
09/19/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6094-6095)
09/11/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/05/2012Became Public Law No: 112-191. (TXT | PDF)
10/05/2012Signed by President.
09/25/2012HousePresented to President.
09/24/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/22/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6671)
09/20/2012SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/19/2012-4:04pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/19/2012-4:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/19/2012-4:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6094-6095)
09/19/2012-3:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6375.
09/19/2012-3:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6094-6096)
09/19/2012-3:53pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/11/2012HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/11/2012HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/11/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/19/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/11/2012 Referred to
House Budget09/11/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6375. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-191 (10/05/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on September 19, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

VA Major Construction Authorization and Expiring Authorities Extension Act of 2012 - Title I: Construction Authorizations - Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out major medical facility projects (projects) in FY2013 at VA medical centers in: (1) Seattle, Washington; (2) Dallas, Texas; and (3) Miami, Florida.

Authorizes appropriations for such projects. Provides project funding limitations.

Title II: Extensions of Certain Expiring Authorities - Extends through FY2013 VA default procedures with respect to guaranteed loans to veterans.

Extends through 2013 VA authority: (1) to operate a regional office in the Republic of the Philippines; (2) to provide treatment, rehabilitation, and related services for seriously mentally ill and homeless veterans; (3) to provide expanded services and housing assistance to homeless veterans; (4) for the Advisory Committee on Homeless Veterans; and (5) to use contract physicians to perform VA medical disability examinations.