Text: H.R.6375 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-191 (10/05/2012)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 191]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 126 STAT. 1437]]

Public Law 112-191
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
   To authorize certain Department of Veterans Affairs major medical 
  facility projects, to amend title 38, United States Code, to extend 
certain authorities of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other 
            purposes. <<NOTE: Oct. 5, 2012 -  [H.R. 6375]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: VA Major 
Construction Authorization and Expiring Authorities Extension Act of 
2012. 38 USC 101 note.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE; TABLE OF CONTENTS.

    (a) Short Title.--This Act may be cited as the ``VA Major 
Construction Authorization and Expiring Authorities Extension Act of 
2012''.
    (b) Table of Contents.--The table of contents for this Act is as 
follows:

Sec. 1. Short title; table of contents.
Sec. 2. References to title 38, United States Code.
Sec. 3. Scoring of budgetary effects.

                  TITLE I--CONSTRUCTION AUTHORIZATIONS

Sec. 101. Authorization of fiscal year 2013 major medical facility 
           projects.
Sec. 102. Authorization of major medical facility project in Miami, 
           Florida.
Sec. 103. Authorization of appropriations.

          TITLE II--EXTENSIONS OF CERTAIN EXPIRING AUTHORITIES

Sec. 201. Extension of authority to calculate the net value of real 
           property securing a defaulted loan for purposes of 
           liquidation.
Sec. 202. Extension of authority for operation of the Department of 
           Veterans Affairs regional office in Manila, the Republic of 
           the Philippines.
Sec. 203. Extension of authority to provide treatment, rehabilitation, 
           and certain other services for seriously mentally ill and 
           homeless veterans.
Sec. 204. Extension of authority to provide expanded services to 
           homeless veterans.
Sec. 205. Extension of authority to provide housing assistance for 
           homeless veterans.
Sec. 206. Extension of authority for the Advisory Committee on Homeless 
           Veterans.
Sec. 207. Extension of authority for the performance of medical 
           disability examinations by contract physicians.

SEC. 2. REFERENCES TO TITLE 38, UNITED STATES CODE.

    Except as otherwise expressly provided, whenever in this Act an 
amendment or repeal is expressed in terms of an amendment to, or repeal 
of, a section or other provision, the reference shall be considered to 
be made to a section or other provision of title 38, United States Code.
SEC. 3. SCORING OF BUDGETARY EFFECTS.

    The budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with 
the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by 
reference to the latest statement titled ``Budgetary Effects of PAYGO 
Legislation'' for this Act, submitted for printing in the

[[Page 126 STAT. 1438]]

Congressional Record by the Chairman of the House Budget Committee, 
provided that such statement has been submitted prior to the vote on 
passage.

                  TITLE I--CONSTRUCTION AUTHORIZATIONS

SEC. 101. AUTHORIZATION OF FISCAL YEAR 2013 MAJOR MEDICAL FACILITY 
                        PROJECTS.

    The Secretary of Veterans Affairs may carry out the following major 
medical facility projects in fiscal year 2013 in the amount specified 
for each project:
            (1) Construction of a mental health building at the 
        Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center, Seattle, 
        Washington, in an amount not to exceed $222,000,000.
            (2) Construction of a spinal cord injury center at the 
        Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center, Dallas, Texas, in 
        an amount not to exceed $155,200,000.
SEC. 102. AUTHORIZATION OF MAJOR MEDICAL FACILITY PROJECT IN 
                        MIAMI, FLORIDA.

    (a) In General.--The Secretary of Veterans Affairs may carry out the 
major medical facility project described in subsection (b) in an amount 
not to exceed a total of $41,000,000.
    (b) Project Described.--The major medical facility project described 
in this subsection is the renovation of the surgical suite and operating 
rooms at the Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center, Miami, 
Florida.
SEC. 103. AUTHORIZATION OF APPROPRIATIONS.

    (a) Authorization of Appropriations for Construction.--There is 
authorized to be appropriated to the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for 
fiscal year 2013 or the year in which funds are appropriated for the 
Construction, Major Projects, account $377,200,000 for the projects 
authorized in section 101.
    (b) Limitation.--In addition to any limitations under section 8104 
of title 38, United States Code, or other provision of law that apply to 
the projects authorized in section 101 and 102, such projects may only 
be carried out using--
            (1) funds appropriated for fiscal year 2013 pursuant to the 
        authorization of appropriations in subsection (a) of this 
        section;
            (2) funds available for Construction, Major Projects, for a 
        fiscal year before fiscal year 2013 that remain available for 
        obligation;
            (3) funds available for Construction, Major Projects, for a 
        fiscal year after fiscal year 2013 that remain available for 
        obligation;
            (4) funds appropriated for Construction, Major Projects, for 
        fiscal year 2013 for a category of activity not specific to a 
        project;
            (5) funds appropriated for Construction, Major Projects, for 
        a fiscal year before 2013 for a category of activity not 
        specific to a project; and

[[Page 126 STAT. 1439]]

            (6) funds appropriated for Construction, Major Projects, for 
        a fiscal year after 2013 for a category of activity not specific 
        to a project.

          TITLE II--EXTENSIONS OF CERTAIN EXPIRING AUTHORITIES

SEC. 201. EXTENSION OF AUTHORITY TO CALCULATE THE NET VALUE OF 
                        REAL PROPERTY SECURING A DEFAULTED LOAN 
                        FOR PURPOSES OF LIQUIDATION.

    Section 3732(c)(11) is amended by striking ``October 1, 2012'' and 
inserting ``October 1, 2013''.
SEC. 202. <<NOTE: 38 USC 315 note.>> EXTENSION OF AUTHORITY FOR 
                        OPERATION OF THE DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS 
                        AFFAIRS REGIONAL OFFICE IN MANILA, THE 
                        REPUBLIC OF THE PHILIPPINES.

    Section 315(b) is amended by striking ``December 31, 2012'' and 
inserting ``December 31, 2013''. Such section 315 shall be carried out 
as amended by this section notwithstanding the date described in section 
151 of the Continuing Appropriations Resolution, 2013.
SEC. 203. EXTENSION OF AUTHORITY TO PROVIDE TREATMENT, 
                        REHABILITATION, AND CERTAIN OTHER SERVICES 
                        FOR SERIOUSLY MENTALLY ILL AND HOMELESS 
                        VETERANS.

    Section 2031(b) is amended by striking ``December 31, 2012'' and 
inserting ``December 31, 2013''.
SEC. 204. EXTENSION OF AUTHORITY TO PROVIDE EXPANDED SERVICES TO 
                        HOMELESS VETERANS.

    Section 2033(d) is amended by striking ``December 31, 2012'' and 
inserting ``December 31, 2013''.
SEC. 205. EXTENSION OF AUTHORITY TO PROVIDE HOUSING ASSISTANCE FOR 
                        HOMELESS VETERANS.

    Section 2041(c) is amended by striking ``December 31, 2012'' and 
inserting ``December 31, 2013''.
SEC. 206. EXTENSION OF AUTHORITY FOR THE ADVISORY COMMITTEE ON 
                        HOMELESS VETERANS.

    Section 2066(d) is amended by striking ``December 31, 2012'' and 
inserting ``December 31, 2013''.

[[Page 126 STAT. 1440]]

SEC. 207. EXTENSION OF AUTHORITY FOR THE PERFORMANCE OF MEDICAL 
                        DISABILITY EXAMINATIONS BY CONTRACT 
                        PHYSICIANS.

    Section 704(c) of the Veterans Benefits Act of 2003 (38 U.S.C. 5101 
note) is amended by striking ``December 31, 2012'' and inserting 
``December 31, 2013''.

    Approved October 5, 2012.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 6375:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 158 (2012):
            Sept. 19, considered and passed House.
            Sept. 21, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>