Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/12/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/19/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/21/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/25/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/28/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/16/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/16/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/16/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/27/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/27/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/27/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/27/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/19/2012