Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/13/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/13/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/13/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/19/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/19/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/19/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 09/21/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/21/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/21/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/21/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/16/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/16/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/16/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/16/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/16/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/16/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/16/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/16/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/16/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/16/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/16/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/16/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/16/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/16/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/16/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/16/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/16/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/16/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/16/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/26/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/26/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 10/26/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/15/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/15/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/15/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/16/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 11/27/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/29/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/29/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/11/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/13/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/17/2012