Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/14/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/14/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/20/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/20/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/20/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/21/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/19/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/19/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/19/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/19/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/19/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/16/2012