Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/20/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/20/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 09/20/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/20/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/25/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/28/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/28/2012
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 10/26/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/30/2012