Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/14/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 09/14/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/21/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/21/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/21/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/21/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/05/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/05/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/02/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/05/2012