Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/14/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/20/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/09/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/16/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/14/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/03/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/17/2012