There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the Department of Veterans Affairs located at 9800 West Commercial Boulevard in Sunrise, Florida, as the "William 'Bill' Kling VA Clinic".


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/20/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 647).(text: CR 12/19/2012 H7331)
09/19/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
12/21/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/20/2012-7:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2012-7:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 647). (text: CR 12/19/2012 H7331)
12/20/2012-6:54pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7414)
12/19/2012-5:39pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Michaud objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
12/19/2012-5:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6443.
12/19/2012-5:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7331-7333)
12/19/2012-5:28pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/11/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/19/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/19/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/19/2012 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health10/11/2012 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs12/21/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6443. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/20/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) at 9800 West Commercial Boulevard in Sunrise, Florida, as the "William 'Bill' Kling VA Clinic."