Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 09/20/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/25/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/16/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/27/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/03/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/11/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/12/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 12/18/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/18/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/18/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 12/18/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/18/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/19/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/19/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 12/31/2012