There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Energy High-End Computing Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Department of Energy High-End Computing Revitalization Act of 2004 to improve the high-end computing research and development program of the Department of Energy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/20/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/10/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
09/20/2012Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/20/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/09/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/09/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/13/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/15/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology09/20/2012 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy and Environment10/10/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6454. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/20/2012)

Department of Energy High-End Computing Act of 2012 - Amends the Department of Energy High-End Computing Revitalization Act of 2004 with respect to: (1) exascale computing (computing system performance at or near 10 to the 18th power floating point operations per second); and (2) a high-end computing sytem with performance substantially exceeding that of systems commonly available for advanced scientific and engineering applications.

Directs the Secretary of Energy (DOE) to: (1) coordinate the development of high-end computing systems across DOE; and (2) include among the multiple architectures researched any computer technologies that show promise of substantial reductions in power requirements and substantial gains in parallelism of multicore processors, concurrency, memory and storage, bandwidth, and reliability.

Repeals authority for establishment of at least one High-End Software Development Center.

Directs the Secretary to conduct a coordinated research program to develop one or more exascale computing systems to advance DOE missions. Requires establishment through competitive merit review of two or more DOE National Laboratory-industry partnerships to conduct integrated research, development, and engineering of one or more prototype exascale systems.

Requires the Secretary to conduct mission-related co-design activities in developing prototype exascale platforms. Defines "co-design" as the joint development of application algorithms, models, and codes with computer technology architectures and operating systems to maximize effective use of high-end computing systems.

Directs the Secretary to develop any advancements in hardware and software technology required to realize fully the potential of an exascale production system in addressing DOE target applications and solving scientific problems involving predictive modeling and simulation and large-scale data analytics and management.