Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 09/20/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 09/20/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/20/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 09/20/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 09/20/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 09/20/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 09/20/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/15/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/16/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/13/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/17/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/18/2012