There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare DMEPOS Market Pricing Program Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to establish a market pricing program for durable medical equipment, prosthetics, orthotics, and supplies (DMEPOS) under part B of the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/21/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/21/2012Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/21/2012Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/21/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 09/21/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 09/21/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/28/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/09/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/09/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/19/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/19/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/19/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/26/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/26/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/26/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/26/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/30/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 10/30/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/30/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/30/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/14/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/14/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/14/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/14/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/27/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/27/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 11/27/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/27/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/27/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 11/27/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/27/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/27/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/27/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/27/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/27/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/27/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/27/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 11/27/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/28/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/28/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/28/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/28/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/28/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 11/28/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 11/28/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/28/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/28/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/28/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/28/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/28/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/28/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/30/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/30/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/30/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/30/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/30/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 12/05/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/05/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/05/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/05/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/05/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/11/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/11/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/11/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/11/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/11/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/11/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/18/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 12/18/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/18/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/02/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/02/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/02/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/21/2012 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/21/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6490.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6490. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/21/2012)

Medicare DMEPOS Market Pricing Program Act of 2012 - Amends part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish a market pricing program for durable medical equipment (DME), prosthetics, orthotics, and supplies (DMEPOS) as a replacement for the competitive acquisition program for DMEPOS, which is hereby terminated.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) conduct annual market-priced auctions from among entities supplying market priced items and services in an eligible market area selected in the auction design, (2) establish a lead product for each of specified product categories, and (3) award a contract to any entity in an eligible market area in which an auction is conducted whose bid is below a clearing price equal to the highest cost bid that will meet capacity targets in the market area.

Requires the Secretary to contract with an auction expert to assist in, and a market monitor to monitor, the design, development, and functioning of the auction.

Adjusts the covered DME item update for 2012 through 2014 and each subsequent year.