Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 09/21/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 09/21/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/28/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/09/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/09/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/19/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/19/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/19/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/26/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/26/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/26/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/26/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/30/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 10/30/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/30/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/30/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/14/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/14/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/14/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/14/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/27/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/27/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 11/27/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/27/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/27/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 11/27/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/27/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/27/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/27/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/27/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/27/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/27/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/27/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 11/27/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/28/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/28/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/28/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/28/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/28/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 11/28/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 11/28/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/28/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/28/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/28/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/28/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/28/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/28/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/30/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/30/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/30/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/30/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/30/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 12/05/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/05/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/05/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/05/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/05/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/11/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/11/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/11/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/11/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/11/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/11/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/18/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 12/18/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/18/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/02/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/02/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/02/2013