Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/21/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/21/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 09/21/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/21/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/21/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 09/21/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/25/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 11/16/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/16/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/16/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 11/29/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/29/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/29/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/29/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/29/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/29/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/29/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/29/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 11/29/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/29/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/29/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/30/2012