Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/10/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/15/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/16/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/16/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/16/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/18/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/18/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/03/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/08/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/08/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/10/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/10/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/10/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/10/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/11/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/11/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/11/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/11/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/11/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/30/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/30/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/31/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/31/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/01/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/01/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/01/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/01/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/01/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/05/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/05/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/05/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/06/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/02/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/01/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/28/2012