Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/29/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/13/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2011