Text: H.R.655 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2011)


112th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 655


To honor Susan B. Anthony by celebrating her legacy on the third Monday in February.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

February 11, 2011

Mrs. Maloney introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform


A BILL

To honor Susan B. Anthony by celebrating her legacy on the third Monday in February.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short Title.

This Act may be cited as the “Susan B. Anthony Birthday Act”.

SEC. 2. Findings.

Congress finds the following:

(1) Susan Brownell Anthony created the first women’s movement in the United States and led that movement for more than 50 years.

(2) Born in South Adams, Massachusetts, on February 15, 1820, Susan B. Anthony met Elizabeth Cady Stanton in 1851 and attended her first women’s rights convention in Syracuse in 1852, where she joined the fight to get women the right to vote, arguing that “the right women needed above every other . . . was the right of suffrage”.

(3) The first proposal for women’s suffrage was presented to Congress in 1868.

(4) Susan B. Anthony appeared before every Congress from 1869 to 1906 to ask for passage of a suffrage amendment.

(5) Susan B. Anthony served as the president of the National Woman Suffrage Association from 1892 until 1900.

(6) Designated then as the 16th amendment, the first formal women’s suffrage amendment to the Constitution of the United States was introduced in January 1878 and stated, “The right of citizens to vote shall not be abridged by the United States or by any State on account of sex.”. This same amendment was introduced in every session of Congress for the next 41 years.

(7) Before her death on March 13, 1906, Susan B. Anthony’s last public words were “Failure is impossible.”.

(8) On May 21, 1919, the House of Representatives passed the 19th Amendment, and 2 weeks later, the Senate followed.

(9) On August 18, 1920, when Tennessee became the 36th State to ratify the amendment, the amendment passed its final hurdle of obtaining the agreement of three-fourths of the States. Secretary of State Bainbridge Colby certified the ratification on August 26, 1920.

(10) The text of the 19th Amendment is: “The right of citizens of the United States to vote shall not be denied or abridged by the United States or by any State on account of sex. Congress shall have power to enforce this article by appropriate legislation.”.

(11) In 1921, a marble statue of Susan B. Anthony and her women’s rights colleagues, Lucretia Mott and Elizabeth Cady Stanton, was dedicated in the United States Capitol.

(12) Susan B. Anthony’s picture has appeared on two postage stamps, the 3-cent purple stamp issued in 1936 and the 50-cent deeper purple stamp issued in 1955.

(13) Susan B. Anthony’s home in Rochester, New York, has been a National Historic Landmark since 1966.

(14) In 1979, Susan B. Anthony was honored by having her image placed on a dollar coin.

(15) No Federal holiday celebrates the birthday of a woman.

SEC. 3. Celebrating Susan B. Anthony’s legacy on the third Monday in February.

Section 6103(a) of title 5, United States Code, is amended by striking “the third Monday in February” and inserting “the third Monday in February, on which day the Nation shall also celebrate the legacy of Susan B. Anthony”.