Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/15/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/15/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/01/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/29/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew