Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 10/16/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/23/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 11/06/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/06/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/06/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/29/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/29/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/30/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/11/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/11/2012