Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 10/16/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 10/16/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 10/23/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/06/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/06/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/13/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/14/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/14/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/15/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/16/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/30/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/30/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/30/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/04/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/11/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/13/2012