Refine your search

16 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
02/14/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-95.
02/14/2012 Signed by President.
02/08/2012 Presented to President.
02/06/2012 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 75 - 20. Record Vote Number: 15.(consideration: CR S343-344)
02/03/2012 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 248 - 169 (Roll no. 33).
02/01/2012 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 112-381 filed.(text of conference report: CR H230-304)
02/01/2012 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
01/31/2012 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
04/07/2011 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Rockefeller; Boxer; Nelson FL; Cantwell; Hutchison; Ensign; DeMint.(consideration: CR S2285)
04/07/2011 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/01/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 223 - 196 (Roll no. 220).
03/23/2011 Committee on Judiciary discharged.
03/23/2011 Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
03/16/2011 Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Transportation, H. Rept. 112-29, Part II.
03/10/2011 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on 112-29, Part I.
02/11/2011 Introduced in House