Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/18/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-210.
12/18/2012 Signed by President.
12/12/2012 Presented to President.
12/06/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7688)
12/04/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 2, 1 Present (Roll no. 614).(text: CR H6599-6602)
11/02/2012 Introduced in House