Text: H.R.6586 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-273 (01/14/2013)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 273]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 126 STAT. 2454]]

Public Law 112-273
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To extend the application of certain space launch liability provisions 
          through 2014. <<NOTE: Jan. 14, 2013 -  [H.R. 6586]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Space 
Exploration Sustainability Act. 51 USC 10101 note.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Space Exploration Sustainability 
Act''.
SEC. 2. ASSURANCE OF CORE CAPABILITIES.

    Section 203 of the National Aeronautics and Space Administration 
Authorization Act of 2010 (42 U.S.C. 18313) is amended by adding at the 
end the following:
    ``(c) Sense of Congress Regarding Human Space Flight Capability 
Assurance.--It is the sense of Congress that the Administrator shall 
proceed with the utilization of the ISS, technology development, and 
follow-on transportation systems (including the Space Launch System, 
multi-purpose crew vehicle, and commercial crew and cargo transportation 
capabilities) under titles III and IV of this Act in a manner that 
ensures--
            ``(1) that these capabilities remain inherently 
        complementary and interrelated;
            ``(2) a balance of the development, sustainment, and use of 
        each of these capabilities, which are of critical importance to 
        the viability and sustainability of the U.S. space program; and
            ``(3) that resources required to support the timely and 
        sustainable development of these capabilities authorized in 
        either title III or title IV of this Act are not derived from a 
        reduction in resources for the capabilities authorized in the 
        other title.

    ``(d) Limitation.--Nothing in subsection (c) shall apply to or 
affect any capability authorized by any other title of this Act''.
SEC. 3. EXTENSION OF CERTAIN SPACE LAUNCH LIABILITY PROVISIONS.

    Section 50915(f) of title 51, United States Code, is amended by 
striking ``December 31, 2012'' and inserting ``December 31, 2013''.
SEC. 4. EXEMPTION FROM INKSNA.

    Section 7(1)(B) of the Iran, North Korea, and Syria Nonproliferation 
Act (50 U.S.C. 1701 note) is amended--
            (1) by striking ``, or for the purchase of goods or services 
        relating to human space flight, that are''; and

[[Page 126 STAT. 2455]]

            (2) by striking ``prior to July 1, 2016'' and inserting 
        ``prior to December 31, 2020''.

    Approved January 14, 2013.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 6586:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD:
                                                        Vol. 158 (2012):
                                    Nov. 13, considered and passed 
                                        House.
                                    Dec. 31, considered and passed 
                                        Senate, amended.
                                                        Vol. 158 (2013):
                                    Jan. 2, House concurred in Senate 
                                        amendment.

                                  <all>

Share This Section