Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 11/13/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/15/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/15/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/15/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/15/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/15/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/15/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/27/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 11/27/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/27/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/27/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/27/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/27/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/27/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/27/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/27/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/27/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/29/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/29/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/29/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/04/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 12/04/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/04/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/04/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/04/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 12/04/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/04/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/04/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/04/2012
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 12/04/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/04/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 12/04/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/04/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/04/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/04/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/04/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 12/05/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/05/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/05/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/05/2012
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 12/05/2012
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 12/05/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/07/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/07/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/07/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/07/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/07/2012