Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 11/13/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/15/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/15/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/27/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 11/27/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/27/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/27/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 12/04/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/04/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 12/04/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/04/2012
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 12/04/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 12/04/2012
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 12/05/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/07/2012
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/07/2012