Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 11/14/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/29/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/29/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/29/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/29/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/29/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/29/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/29/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/29/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/29/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/03/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/03/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/03/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/13/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/13/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/20/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/20/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/02/2013