Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
01/10/2013 Became Public Law No: 112-257.
01/10/2013 Signed by President.
01/01/2013 Presented to President.
12/28/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/28/2012 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8516-8517)
12/05/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6646)
11/30/2012 Introduced in House