Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
01/14/2013 Became Public Law No: 112-274.
01/14/2013 Signed by President.
01/03/2013 Presented to President.
01/01/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H7559; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/30/2012 H7455-7456)
12/28/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 308 - 89 (Roll no. 631).(text: CR H6842-6843)
11/30/2012 Introduced in House