There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Save Our States Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To delay the implementation of the health reform law until the Supreme Court determines the constitutionality of the individual mandate.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/11/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date
03/04/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/28/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/18/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/17/2011Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/11/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Rules, Appropriations, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Rules, Appropriations, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Rules, Appropriations, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Rules, Appropriations, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Rules, Appropriations, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Rules, Appropriations, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Rules, Appropriations, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2011Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Rules, Appropriations, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (8)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/11/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/18/2011 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/11/2011 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce02/11/2011 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions03/04/2011 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/11/2011 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs02/17/2011 Referred to
House Judiciary02/11/2011 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution02/28/2011 Referred to
House Rules02/11/2011 Referred to
House Appropriations02/11/2011 Referred to
House Administration02/11/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.663. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2011)

Save Our States Act - Delays the effective date of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the health care provisions of the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010, and prohibits the federal government from promulgating any further regulations or otherwise preparing to implement the the provisions of such Acts, until the U.S. Supreme Court renders a judgment that includes a holding on the constitutionality of the requirement to maintain minimum essential coverage in any case pending before a federal court on the date of the enactment of this Act.