Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/14/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/08/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/15/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/15/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/31/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/31/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/04/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/16/2012