Text: H.R.6634 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-207 (12/07/2012)




[112th Congress Public Law 207]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 126 STAT. 1495]]

Public Law 112-207
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
  To change the effective date for the Internet publication of certain 
   financial disclosure forms. <<NOTE: Dec. 7, 2012 -  [H.R. 6634]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. CHANGED EFFECTIVE DATE FOR FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE FORMS 
                              OF CERTAIN OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES.

    Section 1(a) of the Act entitled ``An Act to change the effective 
date for the internet publication of certain information to prevent harm 
to the national security or endangering the military officers and 
civilian employees to whom the publication requirement applies, and for 
other purposes'', approved September 28, 2012 (Public Law 112-178; 5 
U.S.C. App. 105 note) is amended by striking ``December 8, 2012'' and 
inserting ``April 15, 2013''.
SEC. 2. <<NOTE: 5 USC app. 105 note.>>  EFFECTIVE DATE.

    The amendment made by section 1 shall take effect on December 8, 
2012.

    Approved December 7, 2012.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 6634:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 158 (2012):
            Dec. 5, considered and passed House.
            Dec. 6, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>