Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/11/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/10/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/10/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 05/06/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/06/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/17/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/01/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/14/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/20/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/08/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/15/2012